NY A04739 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s2000a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in food packaging.

Sponsors

Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s2000a
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.490
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.490
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 4739a
2019-06-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02000 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
S08817 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4739C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4739
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04739
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04739A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04739B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04739C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04739&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback