NY S08711 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.394
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.394
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in public restrooms at service areas operated by the thruway authority.
Title
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in public restrooms at service areas operated by the thruway authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.394 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.581 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a9883a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED 8711A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1279 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09883 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - substituted by s8711a