NY A09883 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s8711a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s8711a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in public restrooms at service areas operated by the thruway authority.
Title
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in public restrooms at service areas operated by the thruway authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s8711a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9883a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.581 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08711 (Same As) 2022-07-20 - SIGNED CHAP.394