NY S08654 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9882A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9882A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the secure choice savings program and participating individuals.
Title
Relates to the secure choice savings program and participating individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9882A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED 8654A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1029 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09882 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - tabled