NY S08598 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the boundaries of the Woodmere fire district to include the village of Woodsburgh.
Title
Extends the boundaries of the Woodmere fire district to include the village of Woodsburgh.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1568 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10568 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to local governments