NY S08558 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4607B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4607B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Title
Provides a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4607B |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1903 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8558A |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04607 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - tabled