NY A04607 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Title
Provides a heart disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | vetoed memo.112 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1903 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8558A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.448 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.448 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 4607b |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 4607a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08558 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4607B