NY S08484 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Title
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.744 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04534 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in economic development