NY S08471 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes animal fighting as a criminal act for purposes of enterprise corruption crimes.
Title
Includes animal fighting as a criminal act for purposes of enterprise corruption crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.788 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07303 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes