NY S08204 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.370
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.370
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the director of the upstate flood mitigation task force; relates to assessments of Erie Canal system operation procedures related to flood mitigation and management.
Title
Designates the director of the upstate flood mitigation task force; relates to assessments of Erie Canal system operation procedures related to flood mitigation and management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.370 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.625 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | substituted for a9177c |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 8204A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.919 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09177 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - substituted by s8204a