NY S08203 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8427A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates the two year restriction on temporary retail permits for applications subject to the 500 foot law; provides that a temporary retail permit may not be issued in a city with a population of one million or more people if a retail license at the location was canceled, suspended or revoked by the authority for two consecutive licensees at such location.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates the two year restriction on temporary retail permits for applications subject to the 500 foot law; provides that a temporary retail permit may not be issued in a city with a population of one million or more people if a retail license at the location was canceled, suspended or revoked by the authority for two consecutive licensees at such location.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A8427A
2024-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1579
2024-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-01-12SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08427 (Same As) 2024-10-09 - signed chap.426

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback