NY A08427 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - print number 8427a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - print number 8427a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the two year restriction on temporary retail permits for applications subject to the 500 foot law; provides that a temporary retail permit may not be issued in a city with a population of one million or more people if a retail license at the location was canceled, suspended or revoked by the authority for two consecutive licensees at such location.
Title
Eliminates the two year restriction on temporary retail permits for applications subject to the 500 foot law; provides that a temporary retail permit may not be issued in a city with a population of one million or more people if a retail license at the location was canceled, suspended or revoked by the authority for two consecutive licensees at such location.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | print number 8427a |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-12-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08203 (Same As) 2024-01-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS