US HB7593 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the authority of the Director of the Congressional Research Service to obtain information directly from agencies of the Federal government.
Title
Modernizing the Congressional Research Service’s Access to Data Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Modernization. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2024-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7593/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7593/BILLS-118hr7593ih.pdf |