NY S08134 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain charitable annuities may be unisex in nature and shall be computed on the basis of currently applicable mortality tables for calculating the reserves for individual annuities; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that certain charitable annuities may be unisex in nature and shall be computed on the basis of currently applicable mortality tables for calculating the reserves for individual annuities; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.767 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08164 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to insurance