NY S08059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the financing and construction of facilities by the dormitory authority for North Country School.
Title
Provides for the financing and construction of facilities by the dormitory authority for North Country School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10309 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1014 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10309 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.159