NY S08045 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that provisions relating to minimum maintenance roads in designated towns shall be construed as limiting, diminishing or otherwise affecting the powers of any municipality other than the designated town.
Title
Provides that provisions relating to minimum maintenance roads in designated towns shall be construed as limiting, diminishing or otherwise affecting the powers of any municipality other than the designated town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.108 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.334 |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | substituted for a8498 |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.184 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08498 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - substituted by s8045