NY A08498 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - substituted by s8045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - substituted by s8045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that provisions relating to minimum maintenance roads in designated towns shall be construed as limiting, diminishing or otherwise affecting the powers of any municipality other than the designated town.
Title
Provides that provisions relating to minimum maintenance roads in designated towns shall be construed as limiting, diminishing or otherwise affecting the powers of any municipality other than the designated town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assembly | substituted by s8045 |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.334 |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08045 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.108