NY S08026 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10721A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10721A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public utility lines and bicycle paths on certain state lands in the forest preserve and establishes a forest preserve health and safety land account.
Title
Allows public utility lines and bicycle paths on certain state lands in the forest preserve and establishes a forest preserve health and safety land account.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10721A |
2016-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8026A |
2016-06-17 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1668 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10721 (Same As) 2016-07-29 - opinion referred to judiciary