NY S07864 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines a public group self-insurer for the payment of compensation to employees of county self-insurance plans, boards of cooperative educational services and consortia by boards of cooperative educational services; makes related provisions.
Title
Defines a public group self-insurer for the payment of compensation to employees of county self-insurance plans, boards of cooperative educational services and consortia by boards of cooperative educational services; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 7864A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1309 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10063 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - print number 10063a