NY S07843 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conditional release for eligible offenders who complete post-secondary degrees or programs; provides release twelve months before the completion of the controlling minimum period of imprisonment for eligible offenders who complete post-secondary degrees or programs.
Title
Relates to conditional release for eligible offenders who complete post-secondary degrees or programs; provides release twelve months before the completion of the controlling minimum period of imprisonment for eligible offenders who complete post-secondary degrees or programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.585 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-12-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04888 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to correction