NY S07836 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to human trafficking courts; authorizes transfer of cases after arraignment, by order or with consent of the DA, to another local criminal court or a designated human trafficking court.
Title
Relates to human trafficking courts; authorizes transfer of cases after arraignment, by order or with consent of the DA, to another local criminal court or a designated human trafficking court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.191 |
2018-08-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1023 |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a9870 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.714 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09870 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7836