NY A09870 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7836
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7836
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to human trafficking courts; authorizes transfer of cases after arraignment, by order or with consent of the DA, to another local criminal court or a designated human trafficking court.
Title
Relates to human trafficking courts; authorizes transfer of cases after arraignment, by order or with consent of the DA, to another local criminal court or a designated human trafficking court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7836 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1023 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07836 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.191