NY S07827 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the appointment of the members of the New York state housing finance agency, the housing trust fund corporation and the affordable housing corporation.
Title
Provides for the appointment of the members of the New York state housing finance agency, the housing trust fund corporation and the affordable housing corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1359 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10601 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - referred to housing