NY S07770 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sales of certain property made to the Suffolk County Landbank Corporation.
Title
Relates to sales of certain property made to the Suffolk County Landbank Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.440 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.304 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a10143b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED 7770B |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED 7770A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1305 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10143 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7770b