NY S07694 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Albany county.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Albany county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9877 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1578 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09877 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.145