NY A09877 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Albany county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Albany county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1578
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7694
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.885
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-02-15Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07694 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9877

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback