NY S07679 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7679B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7679B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.
Title
Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7679B |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2016-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7679A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06878 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.277