NY S07679 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain payments to the Hampton Bays Public Library from the Town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, from its community preservation fund in relation to the limit upon real property tax levies by local governments.
Title
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain payments to the Hampton Bays Public Library from the Town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, from its community preservation fund in relation to the limit upon real property tax levies by local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1544 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09909 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means