NY S07625 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10065 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10065 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - signed chap.69