NY A10065 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.69 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.532 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7625 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.770 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07625 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10065