NY S07605 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from December 31, 2010 until December 31, 2015, the expiration of the New York state French and Indian war 250th anniversary commemoration commission.
Title
Extends from December 31, 2010 until December 31, 2015, the expiration of the New York state French and Indian war 250th anniversary commemoration commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1090 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05625 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES