NY A05625 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from December 31, 2010 until December 31, 2015, the expiration of the New York state French and Indian war 250th anniversary commemoration commission.
Title
Extends from December 31, 2010 until December 31, 2015, the expiration of the New York state French and Indian war 250th anniversary commemoration commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2014-06-18 | Senate | STAR REMOVED |
2014-06-10 | Senate | STARRED ON CALENDAR |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1090 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7605 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5625a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.266 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.220 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07605 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A