NY S07586 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1299 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05633 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes