NY A05633 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | print number 5633a |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07586 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES