NY S07577 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of labor to create and distribute to employers written materials regarding mental health services and resources available to employees to be posted in the workplace; directs voluntary guidance for employers to put in place strategies and programs to support the mental health and wellness of their employees; provides that such guidance be in written and digital resources and in English or translated to an additional primary language or languages as applicable.
Title
Directs the commissioner of labor to create and distribute to employers written materials regarding mental health services and resources available to employees to be posted in the workplace; directs voluntary guidance for employers to put in place strategies and programs to support the mental health and wellness of their employees; provides that such guidance be in written and digital resources and in English or translated to an additional primary language or languages as applicable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1437 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7577B |
2022-04-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7577A |
2022-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-12-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08675 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means