NY S07544 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.525
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows state police officers to receive an improved death benefit where such officers die without twenty years of service credit but with enough unused vacation and sick time to get them to twenty years of service credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows state police officers to receive an improved death benefit where such officers die without twenty years of service credit but with enough unused vacation and sick time to get them to twenty years of service credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 SIGNED CHAP.525
2010-09-07 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-01 returned to senate
2010-07-01 passed assembly
2010-07-01 ordered to third reading rules cal.539
2010-07-01 substituted for a10753a
2010-06-28 referred to ways and means
2010-06-28 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-28 REPASSED SENATE
2010-06-24 AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7544A
2010-06-24 VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2010-06-24 returned to senate
2010-06-24 RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2010-06-23 referred to ways and means
2010-06-22 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-22 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-22 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1102
2010-06-15 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-08 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2010-04-20 REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10753 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7544a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback