NY A10753 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-14)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7544a
Status: Introduced on April 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7544a
Summary
This bill allows state police officers to receive an improved death benefit if they die without 20 years of service but with enough vacation and sick time to reach 20 years.
Title
Allows state police officers to receive an improved death benefit where such officers die without twenty years of service credit but with enough unused vacation and sick time to get them to twenty years of service credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | substituted by s7544a | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.539 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-07-01 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-24 | print number 10753a | |
2010-06-24 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-05-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-19 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07544 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.525
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10753&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |