NY S07470 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to agency regulatory agendas and extends provisions relating to requiring certain agencies to submit such agendas for publication.
Title
Relates to agency regulatory agendas and extends provisions relating to requiring certain agencies to submit such agendas for publication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1029 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |