NY S07403 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the answer time when a major capital improvement rent increase has been filed to ninety days.
Title
Extends the answer time when a major capital improvement rent increase has been filed to ninety days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1018 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03818 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes