NY S07333 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires board of parole administrative appeal findings and recommendations to be published on a website with a word-searchable database and provided to correctional facility law libraries on a quarterly basis.
Title
Requires board of parole administrative appeal findings and recommendations to be published on a website with a word-searchable database and provided to correctional facility law libraries on a quarterly basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.44 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.619 |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | substituted for a8960 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.61 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08960 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - substituted by s7333