NY A08960 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s7333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s7333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires board of parole administrative appeal findings and recommendations to be published on a website with a word-searchable database and provided to correctional facility law libraries on a quarterly basis.
Title
Requires board of parole administrative appeal findings and recommendations to be published on a website with a word-searchable database and provided to correctional facility law libraries on a quarterly basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Assembly | substituted by s7333 |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.619 |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07333 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.44