NY S07282 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 394 between the village of Falconer, the town of Poland, county of Chautauqua, and through the town of Randolph, county of Cattaraugus as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 394 between the village of Falconer, the town of Poland, county of Chautauqua, and through the town of Randolph, county of Cattaraugus as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.704 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7282A |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05567 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - print number 5567a