NY S07223 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage clams.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage clams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10113 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1337 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10113 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - signed chap.143