NY A10113 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage clams.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage clams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.143 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1337 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7223 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.868 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07223 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10113