NY S07218 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to provide bussing to pre-kindergarten students.
Title
Authorizes school districts to provide bussing to pre-kindergarten students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.244 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10397a |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED 7218A |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1035 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10397 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7218a