NY S07216 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to where beer may be sold relating to brewpubs.
Title
Relates to where beer may be sold relating to brewpubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.366 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.555 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10667 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1247 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A10667 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7216