NY S07209 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.492
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.492
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to off-hours arraignment parts in counties outside the city of New York; authorizes the establishment of a plan to designate off-hours arraignment parts in select local criminal courts of a county.
Title
Relates to off-hours arraignment parts in counties outside the city of New York; authorizes the establishment of a plan to designate off-hours arraignment parts in select local criminal courts of a county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.492 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.210 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10360 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1908 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7209A |
2016-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10360 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7209a