NY S07194 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the office for the aging to receive criminal history information on prospective employees and volunteers.
Title
Permits the office for the aging to receive criminal history information on prospective employees and volunteers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1095 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A10545 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - referred to aging