NY S07179 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional services or supports for youths who were previously in the foster care system; deals with the reentry of former foster care children back into the foster care system.
Title
Provides for additional services or supports for youths who were previously in the foster care system; deals with the reentry of former foster care children back into the foster care system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.798 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.683 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7681a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1680 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07681 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7179