NY A07681 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional services or supports for youths who were previously in the foster care system; deals with the reentry of former foster care children back into the foster care system.
Title
Provides for additional services or supports for youths who were previously in the foster care system; deals with the reentry of former foster care children back into the foster care system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7179 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.683 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | print number 7681a |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07179 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.798